Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Us Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties, Popoli, Cathi J, Popoli Jr, Thomas E, Queens Park Community Services Association Inc, Regions Bank, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Evidence Inventory Worksheet | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Writ of Possession | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk to Issue Writ of Possession | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Receipt Number had a refund of $50.00 amount sent to Aleksandra Novakovich | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.