Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Garcia, Marisela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Zainer, Roland John, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Zainer, Roland John Recorded 2014-12-16 Instrument# 5063855 | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.