Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Onewest Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against All Other Unknown Parties, Portfolio Recovery Associates, L L C, United States Of America, Acting On Behalf Of The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Spouse Of C. Russell Wimer, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notification to Clerk's Accounting Regarding Surplus | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of Surplus Trustee | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $43.00 on receipt 619497, Fully Paid | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt Revised | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $15.00 on receipt 636835, Fully Paid | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Disburse - Registry | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Directing the Disbursement of Foreclosure Surplus Funds |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.