Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Passidomo, Kathleen C, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against John M Passidomo Insurance Trust Agreement, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryTrust Litigation |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Modifying Trust Recorded 2014-01-07 Instrument# 4931853 | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Paid $400.00 on receipt 553798, Fully Paid | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition - Continued | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Trust Litigation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.