Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Polick Sr, Vincent J., filed a(n) Condominium - Property case against Avellino Isles Condominium Association, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryCondominium |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Evidence Inventory Worksheet | |
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Avellino Isles Condominium Association, Inc., Recorded 2015-04-23 Instrument# 5112241 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Avellino Isles Condominium Association, Inc., | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 4/20/2015 9:00:00 AM due to per judge's office | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Vincent J. Polick Sr. | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer - Amended by Polick, Vincent J. Sr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.