Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Delacey, Karen, Delacey, Mark, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Dahlke, James, Dahlke, Marcia, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hugh D Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHugh D Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hayes, Hugh D | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Dahlke, James,Dahlke, Marcia | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice/Certificate of Mailing | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Action | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter to Business Observer | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Diligent Search Dahlke, James,Dahlke, Marcia | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service of Summons on Dahlke, James | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service of Summons on Dahlke, James,Dahlke, Marcia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.