Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Onewest Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mulligan, Ken, The Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries Devisees Grantees Assignees Lienors Creditors Trustees And All Others Who May Claim An Interest In The Estate Of Martha G Mulligan, United States Of America Acting On Behalf Of The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Developement, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Federal National Mortgage Association | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Issuance of Amended Certificate of Title | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Judge, from Counsel | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Order for Issuance of Amended Certificate of Title | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $50.00 on receipt 639093, Fully Paid | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Issuance of Amended Certificate of Title | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Counsel from Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.