Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Heritage Bay Single Family Homes I, Inc., A Florida Non-Profit Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Halunen, Diane K., Halunen, John S., in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryOther Real Property Action $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Release of Lis Pendens Halunen, John S.,Halunen, Diane K. | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hayes, Hugh D | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Halunen, Diane K., served 12/30/2013 | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Halunen, John S., served 12/30/2013 | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2014, Judge Frederick R Hardt To Judge Hugh D Hayes | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Paid $425.00 on receipt 553009, Fully Paid | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted by Attorney on Natural Person CA for John S. Halunen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.