Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against All Other Persons Claiming By, Through, Under, Or Against Defendant, Botana, Julia, The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Spouse Of Julia Botana, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Disburse - Registry | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Timothy Casey Trustee Of The 681 3Rd St Sw Land Trust U-A-D 12-4-14 With Full Power And Authority Pursuant To The Declaration Of Trust To Protect Conserve Sell Lease Encumber Ot Otherwise Manage And Dispose Of The Real Estate Descr | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $133,000.00 | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Timothy Casey Trustee Of The 681 3Rd St Sw Land Trust U-A-D 12-4-14 With Full Pwoer And Authority Pursuant To The Declaration Of Trust, To Protect Conserve, Sell, Lease, Encumber Or Otherwise Manage And Dispose Of The Real Estate De | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $6,650.00 on receipt 637373, Fully Paid | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $133,000.00 3Rd Party | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $135,933.50 on receipt 637532, Fully Paid | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Deposit - Registry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.