Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A., As Trustee For American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2006-3, Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gonzalez Jr, Ruben L., The Fountains, Unit No. 5, Condominium Association, Inc., Unknown Spouse Of Ruben L Gonzalez Jr, Unknown Tenant In Possession No. 1, Unknown Tenant In Possession No. 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoster, Joseph G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Evidence Inventory Worksheet | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Writ of Possession | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk to Issue Writ of Possession | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Paid $50.00 on receipt 747476, Balance Due: $50.00 | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Possession | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;111871;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/13da4cb8-af2a-42c4-b05f-0d50cbc6e951/results/58cfd071-502c-441c-a948-516d15ea3ff0/lines/9df9be87-6050-46df-935a-f48a392cc7c9/Doc Certificate of Title to Citibank, N.A. As Trustee For American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2006-3. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.