Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arthrex, Inc., filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case against Hayhurst, M.D., John O., Smith & Nephew, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance by Pittenger, Thomas Todd for Arthrex, Inc. | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hayes, Hugh D | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;61130;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/13da4cb8-af2a-42c4-b05f-0d50cbc6e951/results/1eaf6d70-29cb-4ab6-9b21-613239e64bc4/lines/e58ff3e3-6281-43a1-8c4b-da92ed671804/Doc Case Consolidated/Do Not Docket in this Case |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Consolidate | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Counts | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Dupre, Steven Charles (Defendant) | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Attorney Mark Hebert present for Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.