Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Paarz, Virginia V, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case against Melanie L Dattilio As Special Administrator Of The Estate Of Jeffrey David Paarz, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Release of Lis Pendens | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated/Do Not Docket in this Case | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Consolidate | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Judge, from Counsel | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Consolidate | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service of Summons on Melanie L Dattilio As Special Administrator Of The Estate Of Jeffrey David Paarz, | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice To Defendant To File A Responsive Pleading | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service of Process for Paarz, Virginia V,Melanie L Dattilio As Special Administrator Of The Estate Of Jeffrey David Paarz, served 03/03/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.