Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties, Any Unknown Persons In Possession, Kimble, Sydney J., Pryor A K A Cheryl Pryor N K A Cheryl L. Kimble, Cheryl L., Unknown Spouse Of Cheryl L. Pryor A K A Cheryl Pryor N K A Cheryl L. Kimble, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Disburse - Registry | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Nafdof Private Series 1 Llc | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $256,200.00 | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk Of Court To Issue A Corrected Certificate Of Sale - Amended | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Nafdof Private Series 1, Llc | |
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk Of Courts To Issue A Corrected Certificate Of Sale | |
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Paid $1.00 on receipt 615308, Fully Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.