Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Gary, Kiana Marshay, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 23, 2021D6 CLEARED
Date: January 10, 2022PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #121573
Date: January 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMKEE | |
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMKEE | |
January 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #121573 | |
January 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/22/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $134.00 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMKEE | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR017607 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.