Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Berry, Makayla Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 22, 2021PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #121789
Date: January 11, 2022D6 CLEARED
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #121789 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AD7QGTE | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD7QGTE | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/22/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $134.00 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD7QGTE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD7QGTE | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AD7QGTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.