Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Allen, D Marcus Kahlid, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 06, 2021PAYMENT $187.50 RECEIPT #181963
Date: March 06, 2023D6 CLEARED PAID COLLECTIONS
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $97.50 RECEIPT #182514 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMCRE | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMCRE | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $187.50 RECEIPT #181963 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED PAID COLLECTIONS | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - PERDUE BRANDON | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - MSB | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - MSB COLLECTION AGENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.