Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Gantea, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 06, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: November 19, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: October 05, 2021PAYMENT $354.00 RECEIPT #127960
Date: February 25, 2022CLERK'S COVER LETTER
Date: November 19, 2021COURT APPEARANCE COVER LETTER
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $354.00 RECEIPT #127960 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S COVER LETTER | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC2E | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC2E | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | OFFICER CERTIFICATES | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE SET LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.