Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Wolfe, Matthew H, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 05, 2021D6 CLEARED
Date: December 10, 2021PAYMENT $187.00 RECEIPT #118244
Date: December 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $187.00 RECEIPT #118244 | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMBIE | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMBIE | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/07/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $187.00 | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR016853 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEYMBIE | |
September 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.