Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Forrest, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: January 20, 2021D6 CLEARED
Date: September 21, 2021PAYMENT $356.25 RECEIPT #107321
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OY9WE | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $356.25 RECEIPT #107321 | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #107323 | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A1OY9WE | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OY9WE | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - MSB COLLECTION AGENCY | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 04/14/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $285.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.