Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Taylor, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $2,501-$5,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 23, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NON-JURY GENERAL
Date: January 10, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM ON 01/10/2022 @ 3:00 PM
Date: December 02, 2021DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR
Date: January 20, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: September 23, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NON-JURY GENERAL
Date: September 23, 2021SMALL CLAIMS CHECKLIST
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/16/2022 2:37 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022010593 | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NON-JURY GENERAL | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM ON 01/10/2022 @ 3:00 PM | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - SUB SRVD 10/26/2021 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC002649 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.