Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Booker, Tabius M Sr, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Date: March 15, 2021ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY THE NO CONTACT ORDER
Date: March 11, 2021INFORMATION FILED
Date: February 22, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER DISMISSING CASE
Date: May 06, 2021SURETY BOND RELEASE
Date: May 11, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: February 08, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: January 25, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: February 08, 2021PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: February 22, 2021ARREST WARRANT
Date: January 20, 2021ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT
Date: January 20, 2021DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND RELEASE | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY THE NO CONTACT ORDER | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.