Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Clervius, Ritza, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: September 23, 2021NOLLE PROSEQUI ORDER
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: October 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI ORDER | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMIME | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMIME | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.