Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Starling, Alaina Bobetta Marie, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: September 07, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE
Date: September 28, 2021JAIL MEMORANDUM
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 01/06/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - CF - $355.00 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - LINEBARGER COLLECTION AGENCY | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | 60 DAY COLLECTION LETTER | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | JAIL MEMORANDUM | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/4/2021 9:21 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021062326 | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.