Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Plemmons, James Edward, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC MONITORING
Date: September 24, 2021WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: December 14, 2021PLEA
Date: February 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DNA INQUIRY ADDENDUM | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT & SENTENCE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 3/16/2023 1:08 PM / RECEPTION #: 2023012035 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JAIL MEMORANDUM | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.