Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Merrill, William Shannon Lee, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with LESTER, DON H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLESTER, DON H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER SETTING BOND
Date: September 23, 2021CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT
Date: October 07, 2021PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED TO 2021MM001242 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEYMKOE | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF001385 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.