Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midflorida Credit Union, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against All Precision Grading, Inc., Blanchett, Joshua E, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Civil (Monetary Damages) $15,001-$30,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOSHUA BLANCHETT
Date: September 07, 2021UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO JOSHUA E BLANCHETT
Date: May 09, 2022UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO ALL PRECISION GRADING, INC
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/17/2022 10:04 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022031207 | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO JOSHUA E BLANCHETT | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO ALL PRECISION GRADING, INC | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 2ND PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOSHUA E. BLANCHETT | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #130697 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 2ND PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALL PRECISION GRADING, INC. | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO ALL PRECISION GRADING, INC. | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO JOSHUA BLANCHETT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #121649 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.