Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Trufant, Carole Blalock Barling, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Barling, James S, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
This complaint is a cause of action for unlawful detainer, which is a violation of Chapter 82 of the Florida Statutes. The plaintiff, Carole A. Trufant, is seeking possession of the real property located at 3064 Moody Avenue, Orange Park, FL 32065. T...
PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #69871
Date: January 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO EXECUTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; PLAINTIFF PUT IN POSSESSION ON 2/10/21 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/8/2021 11:17 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021007869 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND SENT TO CCSO WITH FEES | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH DEFAULT ISSUED | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION / UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/8/2021 8:02 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021007724 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $375.00 RECEIPT #72297 (RE: LETTER) | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 69871 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS POSTED 1/25/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.