Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Ryan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hastings Brett A, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Cassidy, William, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: November 03, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 19, 2022DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: January 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED A TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 23, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #107911
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 9/8/2022 3:39 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022054564 | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION 12/13/22 @ 2:00 PM | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; SERVED SUBPOENA TO DAYSHA C FOR RECORDS CUSTODIAN ST VINCENT'S CLAY COUNTY ON 3.25.22 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; SERVED SUBPOENA TO LISA SWARTOUT FOR RECORD CUSTODIAN COASTAL SPINE AND PAIN CENTER ON 3.14.22 | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; SERVED SUBPOENA TO NICOLE JONES FOR RECORD SUSTODIAN ADVANCED DIAGNOSTICS GROUP ON 3.14.22 | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; SERVED SUBPOENAT O DANA HAVENER FOR RECORD SUSTODIAN PRIMS MED FAMILY MEDICINE ON 3.14.22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.