Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barton, Jennifer, Barton, Timothy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Butler, Blair, against Sites, Andrew, represented by Sholes, Ronald E, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with SHARRIT, MICHAEL S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHARRIT, MICHAEL S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Jennifer Barton and Timothy Barton against Andrew Sites in the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in Clay County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000, excluding attorneys' fees, interest, and...
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #69842
Date: January 20, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 9/8/2021 3:56 PM / RECEPTION #: 2021056435 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S, JENNIFER BARTON, PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ANDREW SITES | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S, TIMOTHY BARTON, PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ANDREW SITES | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, TIMOTHY BARTON'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT, ANDREW TYLER SITES | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, JENNIFER BARTON'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT, ANDREW TYLER SITES | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, ANDREW TAYLOR SITES' INTERROGATORIES | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.