Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM (UNEXECUTED) | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 02/01/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN E/ , JDG: SCHENCK, KEITH | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDATION REFERRING CASE BACK TO CIRCUIT COURT JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.