Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2021044613 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD E - Recorded (OR.3137.525. / 2021011137) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2021001593 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.