Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FRITTON, JOEL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRITTON, JOEL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution-Pro Se |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | INJUNCTION STATUS CHANGED TO RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- OARFRGM 8/18/2021 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE E - Recorded (OR.3196.2395. / 2021057106) | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AFTER PRE-TRIAL | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FRITTON, JOEL D: ASSIGNED | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE USING ZOOM VIDEO TELEPHONE CONFERENCING | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- NOHGM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.