Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE E - Recorded (OR.3209.1282. / 2021066758) | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION CLOSE-OUT REPORT | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | WIFE'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO WIFE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE YOUMANS, STACY M: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.