Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryFormal |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE E- - Recorded (OR.3310.2276. / 2022056753) | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 2ND NOTICE BY CLERK - NON TAXABLE CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR ESTATE TAX DUE | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 2ND NOTICE BY CLERK - PROBATE CLOSING DOCUMENT | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE BY CLERK - PROBATE CLOSING DOCUMENT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | 2ND NOTICE BY CLERK - PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE BY CLERK - NON TAXABLE CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR ESTATE TAX DUE | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE YERMAN, MARK J: ASSIGNED | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE BY CLERK - PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE FRITTON, JOEL D: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.