Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategorySummary 1,000.01 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS E - Recorded (OR.3165.2197. / 2021033300) | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE AFTER JUDICIAL REVIEW | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE YOUMANS, STACY M: ASSIGNED | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS - E - Recorded (OR.3126.315. / 2021002743) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 01/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000035 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ESCROW E-PORTAL REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.