Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryNegl - Comml Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint is filed by Caroline Bonnano against Hallmark Group Management, Inc., also known as Hallmark Management, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Hallmark in maintaining the premises of an apartment complex known as Raintre...
RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: August 26, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES FOR PLAINTIFF CAROLINE BONANNO | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES FOR PLAINTIFF CAROLINE BONANNO | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HALLMARK GROUP MANAGEMENT INC D/B/A HALLMARK MANAGEMENT INCS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HALLMARK GROUP MANAGEMENT INC DBA HALLMARK MANAGEMENT INCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SURVEILLANCE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.