Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: July 14, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: September 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3208.1706. / 2021066153) | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF COURTS ORDER DATED MARCH 19 2021 IN CASE NO 2020CA676 RETURNS OF SERVICE AND DEFAULT OR RETURNS OF NON SERVICE AND ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021027326 | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID JR ASSIGNED | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 07/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000533 A | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.