Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by James S. Catizone against Progressive Select Insurance Co. in the Circuit Court of the STH Judicial Circuit in Citrus County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000. The cause of action is a motor vehicle...
COVER SHEET
Date: July 08, 2021COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 08, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO
Date: November 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.3236.2442. / 2021087607) | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS WITHDRAWAL OF ALL REQUESTS FOR COPIES T DEFENDANTS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO NOTICE OF NON PARTY PRODUCTION | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFSINTERROGATORIES | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.