Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 13, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE AS TO DATE ONLY
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 07, 2021PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 08, 2021INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 31, 2021PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: September 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 25, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 25, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FROM DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: August 29, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021026340
Date: July 08, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: July 06, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: April 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.3280.1624. / 2022032071) | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS WITHDRAWAL OF ALL REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANTS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY NOTICES OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE AS TO DATE ONLY | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANTS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.