Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther-Business Transaction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COVER SHEET
Date: May 25, 2021FINAL ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: July 29, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 14, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021020462
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO EARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING AND NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021020462 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS ASSIGNED | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.