Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITILE
Date: May 20, 2021PAYMENT $525.50 RECEIPT #2021019888
Date: May 20, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TAX TITLE E - Recorded (OR.3326.2105. / 2022070101) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- 7/21 MDD | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT TO QUIET TAX TITLE | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF LIENS | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- MDD 5/26 REMAILED 7/8 | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION) | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.