Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: May 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 12, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 12, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: June 04, 2021DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: July 01, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT
Date: July 05, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.3210.1174. / 2021067337)
Date: September 27, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: August 17, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR MORE DEFINATE STATEMENT
Date: June 04, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 22, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 12, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021018791
Date: May 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.3210.1174. / 2021067337) | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANYS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE BY DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.