Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by UNDERWOOD RESIDENTIAL GC, LLC against DENNIS BYAS, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DENNIS BYAS, CITRUS SPRINGS CIVIC ASSOCIATION, INC., and UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES OR OTH...
SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 06, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 06, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021018138
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3222.9. / 2021076217) | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (ORIGINAL) | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH/INQUIRY (ORIGINAL) | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.