Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts Circuit with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 03, 2021OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: July 15, 2021PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2021019371
Date: May 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3197.2315. / 2021057925) | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM/GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.