Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by UNDERWOOD RESIDENTIAL GC, LLC against various defendants in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Citrus County, Florida. The purpose of the complaint is to quiet title to a property described ...
LETTER OF COLLECTION
Date: May 07, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021018052
Date: May 07, 2021COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: May 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3211.1872. / 2021068344) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.