Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Tisha Toler against Anthony Failla and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Citrus County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on April 16, 2021, Anthony Faill...
COMPLAINT
Date: May 06, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 06, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: June 10, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: May 25, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 28, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL E - Recorded (OR.3200.1647. / 2021060102)
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 04, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 06, 2021PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021018054
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: April 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF TISHA TOLERS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL E - Recorded (OR.3200.1647. / 2021060102) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.