Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts Circuit with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed by UNDERWOOD RESIDENTIAL GC, LLC against BYRON A. EASTMAN, UNKNOWN HEIRS OF BYRON A. EASTMAN, CITRUS SPRINGS CIVIC ASSOCIATION, INC., and other parties. The purpose of the complaint is to quiet title to a prop...
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS E - Recorded (OR.3165.2246. / 2021033311)
Date: May 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3207.507. / 2021064919) | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION (ADDRESS UNKNOWN) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.