Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a motor vehicle negligence case filed by Charles H. Schaeffer Kocher against David J. Beccia and DMA Cabinets, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that on May 5, 2018, David J. Beccia, who was an employee or agent of DMA Cabinets, Inc., negl...
MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL
Date: April 22, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, DAVID J BECCIA
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL (SENT TO JUDGE FALVEY) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS AND FOR SANCTION | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR COPIES | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE NIMETH, JASON J: ASSIGNED | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.360 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE COPIES | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS DAVID J BECCIA RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.