Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by UNDERWOOD RESIDENTIAL GC, LLC against TARPON IV LLC, CITRUS SPRINGS CIVIC ASSOCIATION, INC., and UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY, TH...
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: April 22, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: April 22, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3186.1303. / 2021049358) | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT & AMENDING COMPLAINT E - Recorded (OR.3181.1820. / 2021045545) | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3170.1428. / 2021037042) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DATEDMARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO 2020CA504 - AMENDED NOTICE OF FILNG | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.