Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by UNDERWOOD RESIDENTIAL GC, LLC against various defendants in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Citrus County, Florida. The purpose of the complaint is to quiet title to a specific property i...
COVER SHEET
Date: April 22, 2021COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: April 22, 2021COPY OF COURTS ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO. 2020CA0504 - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3170.1434. / 2021037044) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DATEDMARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO 2020CA504 - AMENDED - AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF COURTS ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO. 2020CA0504 - NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021016024 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID JR ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.